EP3240367 - BALLAST INDEPENDENT RETROFIT LED LAMP WITH FLICKER REDUCTION CIRCUITRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Hill B.V. Cruquiusweg 111C 1019 AG Amsterdam / NL | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roy, Shounak Cruquiusweg 111-C 1019 AG Amsterdam / NL | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al AG Patents B.V. Kallenkoterallee 82 A 8331 AJ Steenwijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 16167599.6 | 29.04.2016 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240367 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
H05B45/44 (EP,US);
H05B45/14 (US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORSCHALTGERÄTUNABHÄNGIGE NACHRÜST-LED-LAMPE MIT FLIMMERREDUZIERUNGSSCHALTUNG | [2017/44] | English: | BALLAST INDEPENDENT RETROFIT LED LAMP WITH FLICKER REDUCTION CIRCUITRY | [2017/44] | French: | LAMPE À DEL POUR RETROFIT INDÉPENDANT DU BALLAST AVEC UN CIRCUIT DE RÉDUCTION DE PAPILLOTEMENT | [2017/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012168828 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]CN103687176 (LUXUL TECHNOLOGY INC); | [XI]US2014225519 (YU CHUNG-HUNG [TW], et al); | [XI]US2015181661 (HSIA CHUNGHO [US], et al); | [XD]US2015198290 (SEGERS MAARTEN WILLEM [NL], et al) | by applicant | US2015198290 | EP20150193399 |