EP3240332 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SYSTEM INFORMATION BY A BASE NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto M2M GmbH Werinherstraße 81 81541 Munich / DE | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREUER, Volker Schwalbenring 20 16727 Boetzow / DE | 02 /
WEHMEIER, Lars Leistikowstrasse 62 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Grevin, Emmanuel Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Grevin, Emmanuel Gemalto SA 525 avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 Gemenos Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16167799.2 | 29.04.2016 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240332 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12, // H04W84/04, H04W72/12 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON SYSTEM INFORMATIONEN DURCH EINE BASISSTATION | [2017/44] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SYSTEM INFORMATION BY A BASE NODE | [2017/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSMETTRE DES INFORMATIONS DE SYSTÈME PAR UN NOEUD DE BASE | [2017/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016048045 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 14 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0048] , [0050] , [0061] , [0062] , [0080] - [0086] - [0202] , [0203] , [0208] , [0217] *; | [Y] - RAN WG1, "Status Report to TSG 1 Work plan related evaluation", vol. TSG RAN, no. GÖTEBORG; 20160307 - 20160310, (20160306), 3GPP DRAFT; RP-160183, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/Docs/, (20160306), XP051076140 [Y] 1-14 * page 5/2 - page 7/2 * * page 11/2 * * page 17/2 * | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Impact on System Information for In-band Operations of NB-IoT", vol. RAN WG2, no. Budapest, HU; 20160119 - 20160121, (20160118), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-160516 IMPACT ON SYSTEM INFORMATION FOR IN-BAND OPERATIONS OF NB-IOT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTI, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160118), XP051054802 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Email discussion report on [NBAH#05][NBIOT/SI] System Information", vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-161254_NB-IOT_SI_EMAIL-DICUSSION-5, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_93/Docs/, (20160214), XP051065995 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 11111111 * | [XP] - GEMALTO N V, "Applicability of Downlink Sub frames for Transmission", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-163370, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051104901 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * |