EP3085729 - SPONGE CLOTH WITH MESH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalle GmbH Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mans, Leo Kalle GmbH Rheingaustrasse 190 - 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Tüschen, Norbert Kalle GmbH Rheingaustrasse 190 - 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Plate, Jürgen Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwalt Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustraße 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Plate, Jürgen Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 16167905.5 | 18.03.2011 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | DE20101012878 | 26.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010012878 | [2016/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085729 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, A47L13/16 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C08J9/0085 (EP,US);
A47L13/16 (EP,US);
B32B23/10 (EP,US);
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
D21H13/02 (US);
B32B2266/02 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP,US);
B32B2307/554 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7163 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHWAMMTUCH MIT NETZ | [2016/43] | English: | SPONGE CLOTH WITH MESH | [2016/43] | French: | TISSUE-ÉPONGE DOTÉ D ́ UN FILET | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11002240.7 / EP2368936 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3709764 (THOMAS G) [X] 1 * column 1, line 13 - line 24; claims 1-3 *; | [X]NL7802847 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1 * page 1, line 9 - line 11 * * page 4, line 20 - line 28; figure .; claims 1,4 *; | [XY]WO9742259 (ELYSEES BALZAC FINANCIERE [FR], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 6 - line 33 * * page 13, line 12 - line 20 * * page 15, line 1 - line 6 * * page 23, line 11 - line 19 * [Y] 9; | [A]DE19753546 (KALLE NALO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 3 - line 17 * * page 3, line 24 - line 42 ** page 4, line 9 - line 11 *; | [X]EP1314390 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0035] , [0083] *; | [X]US2003135181 (CHEN FUNG-JOU [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0001]; claims 1,3,5 *; | [X]WO2004021855 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * sentence 1 - sentence 7; claims 1,11,16 *; | [X]WO2005034711 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 4, line 15 - line 27 * * page 9, line 11 - line 21 * * page 10, line 10 * * page 11, line 22 *; | [X]US2005136238 (LINDSAY JEFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0162] , [0163] , [0184]; figure 8; claim 27 *; | [X]EP1600096 (CLOROX CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0067] , [0073] , [0078] , [0115]; claim 5 *; | [Y]EP1693407 (KALLE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0012] , [0014] *; | [X]WO2008119990 (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 12; claims 1-5 * | by applicant | DE1193237 | DE2656968 | DE2707308 |