EP3091514 - A LUGGAGE LOCKING DEVICE AND BAGGAGE HANDLING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGIPAS TECHNOLOGIES INC. 200 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 300 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2019/08] |
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states DigiPas USA, LLC 304 W. Main Street, Suite 120 Avon, CT 06001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONG, Ming Hua 10 Stockbridge Lane Avon, CT 06001 / US | 02 /
KIN, Koh Wai 100 Pasir Panjang Road, No. 06-02 118518 Singapore / SG | 03 /
YONG, Kuu Bi 100 Pasir Panjang Road, No. 06-02 118518 Singapore / SG | 04 /
HONG, Jim Li Hui 66 Duchess A venue, No. 03-08 269204 Singapore / SG | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 16167924.6 | 02.05.2016 | [2016/45] | Priority number, date | US201514702862 | 04.05.2015 Original published format: US201514702862 | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091514 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, E05B65/52 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
A45C5/045 (CN);
A45C13/18 (EP,CN,US);
A45C5/141 (CN);
E05B35/105 (EP,US);
E05B65/0092 (US);
E05B65/52 (EP,CN,US);
G06K19/07758 (CN);
G06Q10/04 (CN);
G06Q50/40 (CN);
G07C9/00563 (EP,CN,US);
G07C9/00571 (EP,US);
G07C9/00896 (EP,CN,US);
G08B13/1436 (CN);
G08C17/02 (CN);
H04B5/70 (EP,US);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04W4/38 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
A45C2005/142 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2016/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEPÄCKVERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND GEPÄCKHANDHABUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/45] | English: | A LUGGAGE LOCKING DEVICE AND BAGGAGE HANDLING METHOD | [2016/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE BAGAGES ET PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION DE BAGAGES | [2016/45] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2005051622 (MAK MICHAEL MAN HO [AU]) [I] 25 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0084] * [A] 1,16-19; | [I]EP2737820 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-24 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] *; | [IA]KR20150010885 (LIM KANG SU [KR], et al) [I] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 8,9,24; | [IP]WO2015183949 (BLUESMART INC [US]) [IP] 1-3,7-9,12,15,16,18,23,24 * figures 1A,1B,6 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0054] *; | US2016143407 [ ] (LIM KANG SU [KR], et al) [ ] * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0049] ** paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] *; | [I] - BLUESMART, "Bluesmart", (20150416), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150416150019/http://bluesmart.com/#, (20160901), XP055299210 [I] 1-19 * the whole document * | [I] - Bluesmart, "Bluesmart - The World's First Smart Connected Carry-on Suitcase", (20141020), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=VJnvx7IhAmk, (20160415), XP054976480 [I] 1-19 * the whole document * | [I] - Planet Traveler USA, "Planet Traveler USA - Space Case 1 - The World's Most Advanced Smart Suitcase", (20150223), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=DofHEIquJro, (20160902), XP054976761 [I] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3754164 | US4495540 | US4931789 | US5021776 | US5153561 | US5373718 | US5489017 | US5640862 | US5689979 | US5713226 | US5719771 | US5847656 | US5886644 | US5892441 | US5894277 | WO0019392 | WO0125864 | US6401889 | US6483434 | US6988610 | US7021537 | US7036728 | WO2011149424 | US8161781 | US8531290 | US2013264128 | WO2013154692 | US8630537 | US8635891 |