EP3090915 - TRANSPORT CARRIAGE FOR CUT WOOD CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mercer International inc. Suite 1120 700 West Pender Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 1G8 / CA | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziegenbein, Tobias 3377 West 19th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1C1 / CA | 02 /
Hartmann, Albert Crailsheim Strasse 18 12247 Berlin / DE | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes Stickenbütteler Weg 49 27476 Cuxhaven / DE | [2016/45] | Application number, filing date | 16168455.0 | 04.05.2016 | [2016/45] | Priority number, date | DE201510107000 | 05.05.2015 Original published format: DE102015107000 | [2016/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090915 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B61D9/02 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
B61D9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLZHACKSCHNITZELTRANSPORTWAGEN | [2016/45] | English: | TRANSPORT CARRIAGE FOR CUT WOOD CHIPS | [2016/45] | French: | CHARIOT DE TRANSPORT POUR COPEAUX DE BOIS | [2016/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 16.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2760815 (LA BORDE HILLARD P) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 62; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]US682206 (LAWSON THOMAS [US]) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 75 - page 3, line 116; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US1445215 (HOLT JR CHARLES ABERCROMBIE) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 51 - page 2, line 63; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2012025590 (ELLIOTT C SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, paragraph 0029 - page 4, paragraph 0058; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US366917 (GEORGE E. BLAINE) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 49 - page 2, line 86; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US704578 (MCCONNEY ROBERT B [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 70 - page 3, line 5; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US769752 (LAWSON THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 127; figures 1-11 * | by applicant | EP1690809 |