Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10343355 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | B2 | US2017028635 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201614995507 | 14.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10343330 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | B2 | US2017028628 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931573 | 03.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10279580 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2019 | B2 | US2017028434 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841504 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10232570 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2017028623 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841423 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10232550 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2017028644 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841470 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10201941 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2019 | B2 | US2017028633 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514920748 | 22.10.2015 | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10189242 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2017028636 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201614995620 | 14.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10189241 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2017028634 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931635 | 03.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10189240 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2017028627 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514920779 | 22.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10183478 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2019 | B2 | US2017028621 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931692 | 03.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10166753 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2019 | B2 | US2017028617 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514920767 | 22.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10166752 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2019 | B2 | US2017028624 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841524 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10131132 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2018 | B2 | US2017028619 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841472 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10124570 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2018 | B2 | US2017028625 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201614995742 | 14.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10112380 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2018 | B2 | US2017028620 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841500 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10071545 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2018 | B2 | US2017028640 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201615087882 | 31.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102534738B | Global Dossier | 18.05.2023 | B1 | KR20170015220 | 08.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514920748 | 22.10.2015 | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102534643B | Global Dossier | 18.05.2023 | B1 | KR20170015221 | 08.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841470 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102533087B | Global Dossier | 15.05.2023 | B1 | KR20170015223 | 08.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931573 | 03.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102513438B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2023 | B1 | KR20170015224 | 08.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201614995507 | 14.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102496486B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2023 | B1 | KR20170015222 | 08.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841423 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7127176B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2022 | B2 | JP2021107151 | 29.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931573 | 03.11.2015 | JP2016141077 | 19.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6806478B | Global Dossier | 06.01.2021 | B2 | JP2017077723 | 27.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514920748 | 22.10.2015 | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6803694B | Global Dossier | 23.12.2020 | B2 | JP2017074772 | 20.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841470 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6861482B | Global Dossier | 21.04.2021 | B2 | JP2017071757 | 13.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841423 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6859041B | Global Dossier | 14.04.2021 | B2 | JP2017071213 | 13.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931573 | 03.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6852995B | Global Dossier | 31.03.2021 | B2 | JP2017061139 | 30.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201614995507 | 14.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3741544 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2022 | B1 | EP3741544 | 25.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514920748 | 22.10.2015 | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | EP16168653 | 06.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3533593 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2021 | B1 | EP3533593 | 04.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | EP16168652 | 06.05.2016 | EP18165344 | 06.05.2016 | US201615063400 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3369558 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2021 | B1 | EP3369558 | 05.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | EP16168652 | 06.05.2016 | US201615063400 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3124217 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2021 | B1 | EP3124217 | 19.04.2017 | A3 | EP3124217 | 01.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201614995507 | 14.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3124216 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2020 | B1 | EP3124216 | 26.04.2017 | A3 | EP3124216 | 01.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841423 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3124215 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2020 | B1 | EP3124215 | 19.04.2017 | A3 | EP3124215 | 01.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841470 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3124214 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2020 | B1 | EP3124214 | 26.04.2017 | A3 | EP3124214 | 01.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201514920748 | 22.10.2015 | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3124212 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2020 | B1 | EP3124212 | 19.04.2017 | A3 | EP3124212 | 01.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931573 | 03.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112092359B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2022 | B | CN112092359 | 18.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | CN201610551872 | 13.07.2016 | US201514841470 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111761816B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2022 | B | CN111761816 | 13.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931573 | 03.11.2015 | CN201610551798 | 13.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111546622B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2022 | B | CN111546622 | 18.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | CN201610551874 | 13.07.2016 | US201514841423 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106426918 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201614995507 | 14.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106393688B | Global Dossier | 19.05.2020 | B | CN106393688 | 15.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841423 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106393687B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2020 | B | CN106393687 | 15.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841470 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106393686 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514920748 | 22.10.2015 | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106393667B | Global Dossier | 28.08.2020 | B | CN106393667 | 15.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514931573 | 03.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2798574T | 11.12.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201514841470 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10350878 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2019 | B2 | US2017028637 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615063347 | 07.03.2016 | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10195784 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2019 | B2 | US2017028638 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201615063400 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10183479 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2019 | B2 | US2017028639 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201615063443 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10179446 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2019 | B2 | US2017028588 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201615063417 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102434956B | Global Dossier | 19.08.2022 | B1 | KR20170015226 | 08.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201615063400 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6833376B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2021 | B2 | JP2017074773 | 20.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201615063400 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106426917 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201615063400 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3124213 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2018 | B1 | EP3124213 | 01.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562199665 | 31.07.2015 | US201615063400 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Divisional application | EP3369558 | EP3533593 |