EP3124216 - SYSTEM FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING COMPOSITE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Nick S. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHIGACO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
TORRES, Faraón The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHIGACO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 03 /
ZIEGLER, Ryan G. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHIGACO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 04 /
HARRISON, Samuel F. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHIGACO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 05 /
GRIJALVA, Ciro J. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHIGACO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 06 /
OSBORN, Hayden S. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHIGACO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2017/05] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16168656.3 | 06.05.2016 | [2017/05] | Priority number, date | US201562199665P | 31.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562199665 P | US201514841423 | 31.08.2015 Original published format: US201514841423 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3124216 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3124216 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3124216 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00, B29C70/38, B29B15/12, B29C70/52, B29C64/106, B29C64/20, B29C64/118, B29C64/321, B29C64/364 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
B29C64/118 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C64/124 (KR);
B29C31/08 (KR);
B29C35/08 (KR);
B29C64/106 (EP);
B29C64/20 (KR);
B29C64/321 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/364 (EP,KR,US);
B29C69/001 (KR,US);
B29C70/16 (KR,US);
B29C70/382 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/545 (KR,US);
B33Y10/00 (CN,KR);
B33Y30/00 (KR,US);
B33Y40/20 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | B29C67/00, B29C70/38, B29B15/12, B29C70/52, B29C64/106, B29C64/20 | ||
Former IPC [2017/05] | B29C67/00, B29C70/38, B29B15/12, B29C70/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ADDITIVEN FERTIGUNG VON VERBUNDSTOFFTEILEN | [2017/05] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING COMPOSITE PARTS | [2017/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION DE PARTIES COMPOSITES DE MANIÈRE ADDITIVE | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 11.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2016 | AL | 04.11.2020 | AT | 04.11.2020 | CY | 04.11.2020 | CZ | 04.11.2020 | DK | 04.11.2020 | EE | 04.11.2020 | ES | 04.11.2020 | FI | 04.11.2020 | HR | 04.11.2020 | IT | 04.11.2020 | LT | 04.11.2020 | LV | 04.11.2020 | MC | 04.11.2020 | MK | 04.11.2020 | MT | 04.11.2020 | NL | 04.11.2020 | PL | 04.11.2020 | RO | 04.11.2020 | RS | 04.11.2020 | SE | 04.11.2020 | SI | 04.11.2020 | SK | 04.11.2020 | SM | 04.11.2020 | TR | 04.11.2020 | BG | 04.02.2021 | NO | 04.02.2021 | GR | 05.02.2021 | IS | 04.03.2021 | PT | 04.03.2021 | IE | 06.05.2021 | LU | 06.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.05.2016 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
MK | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
TR | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.05.2016 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
MK | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 06.05.2016 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 06.05.2016 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 04.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5936861 (JANG BOR Z [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 11, line 40 - column 12, line 2014; figure 9 *; | [A]US2005104241 (KRITCHMAN ELIAHU M [IL], et al) [A] 10 * paragraph [0009]; figure 2A *; | [Y]WO2006020685 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0072] *; | [A]WO2013086577 (ERDMAN ALAN [AU]) [A] 6,14-17* claim 29 *; | [XY]US2014061974 (TYLER KENNETH [US]) [X] 1-4,18,20 * paragraphs [0032] , [0040] , [0046] , [0051] , [0053] , [ 0055] , [ 0080] * [Y] 7-9,11-13,19; | [Y]US2014263534 (POST ELIJAH [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026]; figure 6 *; | [Y]WO2014153535 (MARK GREGORY THOMAS [US]) [Y] 11-13 * paragraph [00275]; figure 47 *; | [Y]US2015008422 (LEE JAE IN [KR], et al) [Y] 9 * figure 2 * |