EP3113571 - SENSITIVITY TUNING IN WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Sarabjot 1384 Henry Street Berkeley, CA 94709 / US | 02 /
CHOUDHURY, Sayantan 2211 Sacramento Street Berkeley, CA 94702 / US | 03 /
RANTALA, Enrico-Henrik 1524 A Arch St. Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | 04 /
NAMYOON, Lee 7001 Sunne Ln. No.313 Walnut Creek, CA 94597 / US | 05 /
TUOMAALA, Esa Juhani 5931 Central Ave El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 16168711.6 | 09.05.2016 | [2017/01] | Priority number, date | US201514791295 | 03.07.2015 Original published format: US201514791295 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113571 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H04W74/0808 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2017/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSTIMMUNGSEMPFINDLICHKEIT IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKEN | [2017/01] | English: | SENSITIVITY TUNING IN WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2017/01] | French: | RÉGLAGE DE SENSIBILITÉ DANS DES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL | [2017/01] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/38] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007286122 (FONSECA BENEDITO J [US]); | [XAI]US2014376453 (SMITH GRAHAM KENNETH [US]); | [XAI]WO2015089229 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); |