EP3100663 - AUTOMATIC DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welch, Rodney M. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l., Patent Dept. v.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | Application number, filing date | 16168790.0 | 09.05.2016 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | US201514731511 | 05.06.2015 Original published format: US201514731511 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100663 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
A47L15/4206 (EP,US);
A47L15/4225 (US);
A47L15/4221 (EP,US);
A47L15/4227 (EP,US);
A47L15/4246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHER GESCHIRRSPÜLER | [2016/49] | English: | AUTOMATIC DISHWASHER | [2016/49] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE AUTOMATIQUE | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3576378 (HILMANOWSKI JAMES R) [X] 1,4-7 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 34; figure 1 * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]US3587939 (NYSTUEN ARNE M, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, lines 16-68; figures 1,2 * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]US3750951 (PERL R) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 48; figure 1 * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]DE2938883 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,4 * page 4, paragraphs 3,4; figure 1 * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]EP0381586 (ESSWEIN SA [FR]) [X] 1,4 * column 5, lines 31-55; figure 5 * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]US6622754 (ROTH RYAN KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,11 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 41; figure 2 * [Y] 8-13,15; | [Y]EP1488730 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [Y] 12,13 * paragraph [0018]; figures 4A,4B *; | [Y]EP2671495 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [Y] 8-12 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0031] , [0034] , [0035]; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]EP2756788 (INDESIT CO SPA [IT]) [Y] 15* paragraph [0034]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US7594513 |