EP3150178 - STIMULATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auris Medical Limited 2 Upperton Gardens Eastbourne East Sussex, Sussex BN21 2AH / GB | [2021/15] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Auris Medical Limited 2 Upperton Gardens Eastbourne East Sussex, Sussex BN21 2AH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAMAR, Antonios Camille 2 Upperton Gardens East Sussex Sussex Eastbourne, BN21 2AH / GB | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2017/14] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16168927.8 | 03.09.2009 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | GB20080016448 | 09.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0816448 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150178 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3150178 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/41, // A61H19/00, A61H23/02, A61H23/04 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
A61H19/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61F5/41 (EP,KR,US);
A61H19/30 (EP,US);
A61H19/34 (EP,US);
A61H19/40 (EP,US);
A61H19/50 (EP,US);
A61H23/00 (US);
A61F2005/414 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2005/417 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/14] | A61F5/41 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2017/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/14] | English: | STIMULATION APPARATUS | [2017/14] | French: | APPAREIL DE STIMULATION | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 18.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09785576.1 / EP2361064 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2016 | 10.05.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2016 | 10.05.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2016 | 10.05.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2016 | 10.05.2016 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2016 | 30.09.2016 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2017 | 30.09.2019 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2020 | 30.09.2020 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29807440U (RUESCH WILLY AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,12,15 * page 8 - page 11 *; | [X]WO9844852 (MENTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XDAYI]EP1049433 (ZAMAR ANTONIOS CAMILLE [GB]) [XD] 1,3-5,7,9-12,15 * the whole document * [A] 6,14 [Y] 2,8 [I] 13; | [Y]DE20311823U (LIN JEROME [TW]) [Y] 2,8* page 3; figures 1-3 * |