EP3147842 - METHODS, DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING CALENDAR DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Shan c/o Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Peng c/o Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | 03 /
LIU, Shaohui c/o Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | Underwood, Nicolas Patrick, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16169052.4 | 10.05.2016 | [2017/13] | Priority number, date | CN201510628262 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510628262 | [2017/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3147842 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
G06Q10/1093 (EP,RU,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,RU,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,RU,US);
H04L65/4015 (RU,US);
H04L67/55 (RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] |
Former [2017/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME ZUR VERWALTUNG VON KALENDERDATEN | [2017/13] | English: | METHODS, DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING CALENDAR DATA | [2017/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES POUR GÉRER DES DONNÉES DE CALENDRIER | [2017/13] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.06.2022 | 01.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/43] | 18.06.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007027917 (ARIEL IDO [IL], et al) |