Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
03.03.2021 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
25.02.2021 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
05.07.2020 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
25.05.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2019 | Change - representative | |
27.05.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.04.2019 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
30.12.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
14.12.2018 | First examination report | |
29.05.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.08.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
25.08.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
25.08.2017 | Change - designated states | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
20.01.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
13.05.2016 | Change - representative |