EP3096443 - ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR FOR CONTROLLING THE MOVEMENT OF A MOVING OUTER PART OF AN AIRCRAFT, AND AIRCRAFT INCLUDING ONE SUCH ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LORD Solutions France 400 Chemin des Molles 26600 Pont-de-l'Isère / FR | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/45] | For all designated states Fly By Wire Systems France 1 Avenue Marc Seguin 26240 Saint-Vallier / FR | ||
Former [2016/47] | For all designated states Fly By Wire Systems France 1 Avenue Marc Seguin 26240 Saint-Vallier / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUSSEY, Bastien 7D, Chemin des Dionnières 26600 Tain l'Hermitage / FR | 02 /
BETTINI, Pierre 19, rue de Crussol 07130 Saint-Péray / FR | [2018/47] |
Former [2016/47] | 01 /
ROUSSEY, Bastien 7D, Chemin des Dionnières 26600 TAIN L'HERMITAGE / FR | ||
02 /
BETTINI, Pierre 19, rue de Crussol 07130 SAINT-PERAY / FR | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16169855.0 | 17.05.2016 | [2016/47] | Priority number, date | FR20150054398 | 18.05.2015 Original published format: FR 1554398 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096443 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3096443 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3096443 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/10, H02K7/06 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
H02K5/12 (EP,US);
B64C25/20 (US);
B64C25/24 (US);
H02K7/06 (EP,US);
H02K2205/09 (EP,US);
H02K7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2016/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER ANTRIEB ZUR VERSTELLUNG EINES AUSSENTEILS EINES LUFTGERÄTS, UND LUFTGERÄT MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ANTRIEB | [2016/47] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR FOR CONTROLLING THE MOVEMENT OF A MOVING OUTER PART OF AN AIRCRAFT, AND AIRCRAFT INCLUDING ONE SUCH ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR | [2016/47] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE DE COMMANDE DU DÉPLACEMENT D'UNE PARTIE EXTERNE MOBILE D'UN AÉRONEF, AINSI QU'AÉRONEF COMPORTANT UN TEL ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE | [2016/47] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2016 | AL | 21.11.2018 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | MT | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | IE | 17.05.2019 | LU | 17.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.05.2016 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
MT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.05.2016 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03043163 (LAT SUHL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* page 6, lines 22-24 *; | [A]DE102004047559 (OKIN GES FUER ANTRIEBSTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0056] , [0060] , [0061]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XAI]EP1900081 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1-5,11,12 * paragraphs [0028] , [0005]; figure 2 * [A] 7-10 [I] 6 |