EP3246513 - DOWNHOLE SYSTEM HAVING LATERAL SECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welltec A/S Gydevang 25 3450 Allerød / DK | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜGER, Christian c/o Welltec A/S Gydevang 25 3450 Allerød / DK | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Dragsted Partners A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Hoffmann Dragsted A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 16169973.1 | 17.05.2016 | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246513 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B41/00 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
E21B41/0035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHSYSTEM MIT SEITLICHEN ABSCHNITTEN | [2017/47] | English: | DOWNHOLE SYSTEM HAVING LATERAL SECTIONS | [2017/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FOND DE TROU AYANT DES SECTIONS LATÉRALES | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004055751 (MCGLOTHEN JODY R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,12,13,15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0088]; figure - * [I] 9-11,14; | [XI]US2007256841 (GALLOWAY GREGORY G [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0035] - [0044]; figures 1-6 * [I] 9-11; | [A]US5884704 (LONGBOTTOM JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 23, line 18 - column 24, line 65; figures 23-25 *; | [A]US6158514 (GANO JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |