EP3246130 - COMPRESSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIMGARTNER, Ernst Weinhaldenstr. 20 8645 Jona / CH | 02 /
MAINHART, Patrick An den Bernhecken 17 97499 Donnersdorf / DE | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 16170450.7 | 19.05.2016 | [2017/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246130 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3246130 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3246130 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/10, B21D39/04, H01R43/042 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
B25B27/10 (EP);
B21D39/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRESSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/47] | English: | COMPRESSION DEVICE | [2017/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRESSE | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 03.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2019
25.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE REMS GmbH & Co KG Stuttgarter Strasse 83 71332 Waiblingen / DE Opponent's representative Kohl, Karl-Heinz, et al, et al Jackisch-Kohl und Kohl Stuttgarter Straße 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/49] | 05.11.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.03.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.10.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.12.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 12.08.2021 | Appeal received No. T1306/21 | 12.08.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2016 | AL | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | MT | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | PL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IE | 19.05.2019 | LU | 19.05.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | AT | 19.05.2021 | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 19.05.2016 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MK | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.05.2019 | ||
LU | 19.05.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.05.2016 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.05.2019 | ||
LU | 19.05.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.05.2016 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.05.2019 | ||
LU | 19.05.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.05.2019 | ||
LU | 19.05.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.05.2019 | ||
LU | 19.05.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.05.2019 | ||
LU | 19.05.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.05.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.05.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1092487 (KLAUKE GMBH GUSTAV [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0033]; figures 1,3 * [A] 2; | [XA]DE102004016110 (KLAUKE GMBH GUSTAV [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2; | [AD]EP1786598 (EMERSON ELECTRIC CO [US]) [AD] 1* abstract * | by applicant | EP1786598 | EP2340899 | Opposition | EP1092487 | DE102004016110 | WO2006031548 | EP2340899 |