Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3095719
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2021 |
First examination report |
|
13.05.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
26.05.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
26.05.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
23.05.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.10.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] |
23.05.2016 |
Change - representative |
|