EP3109064 - METHOD FOR CO-POLYMERIZATION, CO-POLYMER AND RUBBER COMPOSITION AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herzog, Katharina Koppelweg 18 31177 Harsum / DE | 02 /
Müller, Lena Hülshagen 53 31714 Lauenhagen / DE | 03 /
Recker, Carla Blumenhagenstrasse 13 30167 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Pruß, Noa Grethenweg 68 60598 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
Conrad, Cathrin Sonja Berliner Strasse 102 34346 Hannoversch Münden / DE | 06 /
Vana, Phillipp Hohenhöfen 5 37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 16170788.0 | 23.05.2016 | [2016/52] | Priority number, date | DE201510211563 | 23.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015211563 | [2016/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109064 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3109064 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08F236/06, C08F293/00 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
B29B7/7495 (EP);
B60C1/0016 (EP);
B60C1/0025 (EP);
C08F236/06 (EP);
C08F293/005 (EP);
C08F2438/03 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/06, C08F2/38 (EP);
C08F236/06, C08F210/02 (EP);
C08F236/06, C08F218/02 (EP);
C08F236/06, C08F220/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2016/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CO-POLYMERISATION, CO-POLYMER UND KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNG SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2016/52] | English: | METHOD FOR CO-POLYMERIZATION, CO-POLYMER AND RUBBER COMPOSITION AND THEIR USE | [2016/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE COPOLYMERISATION, MELANGE DE COPOLYMERE ET DE CAOUTCHOUC ET SON UTILISATION | [2016/52] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2016 | AL | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | IE | 23.05.2019 | LU | 23.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.05.2016 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.05.2016 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2014205137 ; | [XA]WO2010083569 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1-8 * examples 1-47; claims 1-23 * [A] 9,10; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 72, Database accession no. 2014-T78176, XP002762596 & JP2014205137 A 20141030 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * [A] 9,10 | [I] - MASSIMO BENAGLIA ET AL, "Universal (Switchable) RAFT Agents", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20090527), vol. 131, no. 20, doi:10.1021/ja901955n, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6914 - 6915, XP055032697 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja901955n | [I] - DANIEL J. KEDDIE, CARLOS GUERRERO-SANCHEZ, GRAEME MOAD, ROGER J. MULDER, EZIO RIZZARDO, SAN H. THANG, "Chain transfer kinetics of acid/base swithchache N_Aryl-N-Pyridyl Dithiocarbamate RAFT Agents in methyl acrylate, N-vinylcarbazole and vinyl acetate polymerization", MACROMOLECULES, (20120514), vol. 45, doi:dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma300615g, pages 4205 - 4215, XP002762597 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma300615g | [I] - DANIEL J. KEDDIE, CARLOS GUERRERO-SANCHEZ, GRAEME MOAD, EZIO RIZZARDO, SAN H. THANG, "SWITCHABLE REVERSIBLE ADDITON - FRAGMENTATION CHAIN TRANSFER (RAFT) POLYMERIZATION IN AQUEOUS SOLUTION, N,N-DIMETHYLACRYLATE", MARCOMOLECULES, (20110815), vol. 44, doi:DX.DOI.ORG/10.1021/MA200760Q, pages 6738 - 6745, XP002762598 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DX.DOI.ORG/10.1021/MA200760Q | [I] - GRAEME MOAD, MASSIMO BENAGLIA, MING CHEN, JOHN CHIEFARI, YEN K. CHONG, DANIEL J. KEDDIE, EZIO RIUZZARDO AND SAN H. THANG, "Block Copolymer Synthesis through the use of switchable RAFT agents", ACS SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (20110620), doi:10.1021/bk-2011-1066.ch007, pages 81 - 102, XP002762599 [I] 1-10 * page 82 - page 90 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bk-2011-1066.ch007 | by applicant | WO9909036 | DE102006004062 | DE69808622T | WO2008083241 | WO2008083242 | WO2008083243 | WO2008083244 | WO2010049216 | EP2589619 | - G. MOAD; M. BENAGLIA; M. CHEN; J. CHIEFARI; Y. K. CHONG; D. J. KEDDIE; E. RIZZARDO; S. H. THANG, ACS SYMP. SER., (2011), vol. 1066, pages 81 - 102 | - M. BENAGLIA; J. CHIEFARI; Y. K. CHONG; G. MOAD; E. RIZZARDO; S. H. THANG, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2009), vol. 131, no. 20, pages 6914 - 6915 | - M. BENAGLIA; M. CHEN; Y. K. CHONG; G. MOAD; E. RIZZARDO; S. H. THANG, MACROMOLECULES, (2009), vol. 42, no. 24, pages 9384 - 9386 | - G. MOAD; D. KEDDIE; C. GUERRERO-SANCHEZ; E. RIZZARDO; S. H. THANG, MACROMOL. SYMP., (2015), vol. 350, pages 34 - 42 |