EP3098920 - SHRINKABLE MULTILAYER TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ensto Finland Oy Ensio Miettisen katu 2 06100 Porvoo / FI | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aarnio, Anssi Ensio Miettisen katu 2 06100 Porvoo / FI | 02 /
Alkila, Kauko Ensio Miettisen katu 2 06100 Porvoo / FI | 03 /
Väkeväinen, Kenneth Ensio Miettisen katu 2 06100 Porvoo / FI | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 16171031.4 | 24.05.2016 | [2016/48] | Priority number, date | FI20150005390 | 26.05.2015 Original published format: FI 20155390 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098920 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/184 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H02G15/1806 (EP);
H02G15/184 (EP,FI)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRUMPFBARES MEHRSCHICHTROHR | [2016/48] | English: | SHRINKABLE MULTILAYER TUBE | [2016/48] | French: | TUBE MULTICOUCHE THERMORÉTRACTABLE | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 07.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4383131 (CLABBURN ROBIN J T) [X] 1-15 * figure 6 * * column 2, paragraphs 3-27 * * column 3 * * column 5 * * column 13, lines 10-26 *; | [XY]EP0272131 (RAYCHEM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * sentences 23-28 * * column 4 * * column 9, lines 3-27 * * column 10, lines 11-30 * [Y] 5-7,12-14; | [Y]US4363842 (NELSON PAUL N) [Y] 5-7,12-14 * columns 1-2 * * column 3, lines 36-41 * * column 4, lines 3-5 * | by applicant | EP0522760 |