Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017096064 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2017 | A1 | US9604541 | 28.03.2017 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201514876172 | 06.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10220706 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2019 | B2 | US2017197507 | 13.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715470686 | 27.03.2017 | US201514876172 | 06.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102604285B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2023 | B1 | KR20170041113 | 14.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514876172 | 06.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107066282B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2021 | B | CN107066282 | 18.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160015672 | 11.02.2016 | US201514876172 | 06.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3153969 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160015672 | 11.02.2016 | US201514876172 | 06.10.2015 |