EP3101827 - OPTICAL NETWORK SYSTEM, OPTICAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND FAILURE OCCURRENCE SECTION DETERMINATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi 211-8588 Kanagawa / JP | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hibino, Hironori c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 16172134.5 | 31.05.2016 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | JP20150115133 | 05.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015115133 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101827 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/073, H04B10/075, H04B10/077 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
H04B10/0771 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2016/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES NETZWERKSYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTISCHEN ÜBERTRAGUNG UND FEHLERAUFTRITTABSCHNITTSBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/49] | English: | OPTICAL NETWORK SYSTEM, OPTICAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND FAILURE OCCURRENCE SECTION DETERMINATION METHOD | [2016/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU OPTIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA SECTION D'OCCURRENCE DE DÉFAILLANCE | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 31.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1347591 (ECI TELECOM LTD [IL]) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] - [0045] * * figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2003099010 (LIU WEN [CA], et al) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] - [0073] * * figures 1-5 *; | [I]US2007116462 (PELOSO PIERRE [FR], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0074] - [0078] - [0086] - [0092] - [0096] - [0106] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2002176130 (MAENO YOSHIHARU [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0035] - [0049] * * figures 2-6 *; | [A]US6725401 (LINDHORST-KO GWENDA [CA]) [A] 1-7 * column 6, line 32 - column 9, line 19 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JP2003032192 | JP2002280978 |