EP3115054 - ANTIBACTERIAL PHAGE, PHAGE PEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technophage, Investigação E Desenvolvimento Em Biotecnologia, SA Avenida Professor Egas Moniz Edificio Egas Moniz Piso 2 Sala A8 1649-028 Lisboa / PT | For all designated states Tecnifar-Indústria Técnica Farmacêutica, S.A. Rua Tierno Galva Torre 3 12 Piso 1099-036 Lisboa / PT | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
da Costa Garcia, Miguel Ângelo Av. de Pádua, n.º 10, 4º B 1800-297 Lisboa / PT | 02 /
Sousa de São José, Carlos Jorge Rua Alferes Barrilaro Ruas, N.º 9, 2º Dt.º/7 1800-007 Lisboa / PT | 03 /
Rodrigues Leandro, Clara Isabel Praceta Eugénio Salvador, Lt. 10, R/c C 2775-089 Lisboa / PT | 04 /
Rodrigues Pardal Dias Antunes Marçal da Silva, @Filipa Maria Rua do Vale, N.º1, 4º Dt.º, Belas Clube de Campo 2605-193 Belas / PT | 05 /
Grancho Lourenço, Sara Ferreira Llorente Rua de Fanares, 15, 1.º Dt.º 2725-307 Mem Martins / PT | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Ferreira, Maria Silvina, et al Clarke, Modet & Co Av. Casal Ribeiro, N°50-3° andar 1000-93 Lisboa / PT | [2019/47] |
Former [2017/02] | Ferreira, Maria Silvina, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Rua Castilho, 50-9° Andar 1269-163 Lisboa / PT | Application number, filing date | 16172292.1 | 05.02.2010 | [2017/02] | Priority number, date | US20090150585P | 06.02.2009 Original published format: US 150585 P | US20090218345P | 18.06.2009 Original published format: US 218345 P | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3115054 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3115054 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, C12N9/14, G01N33/569, A61K45/06, C07K14/005, C12N7/00, C12N9/64, A61K38/00 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
A61K35/76 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/0014 (RU,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/0073 (US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,RU,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,RU,US);
C12N9/6489 (EP,RU,US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,RU,US);
C12N2795/00032 (US);
C12N2795/10021 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10022 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10032 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2017/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTIBAKTERIELLE PHAGE, PHAGENPEPTIDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/02] | English: | ANTIBACTERIAL PHAGE, PHAGE PEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2017/02] | French: | PHAGE ANTIBACTÉRIEN, PEPTIDES DE PHAGE ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2017/02] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10708834.6 / EP2393502 | Divisional application(s) | EP19201853.9 / EP3650034 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2010 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | IE | 05.02.2020 | LU | 05.02.2020 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.02.2010 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IE | 05.02.2020 | ||
LU | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
IE | 05.02.2020 | ||
LU | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
IE | 05.02.2020 | ||
LU | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0069269 (EXPONENTIAL BIOTHERAPIES INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004052274 (PHAGE BIOPHARM LLC [US], et al); | by applicant | US5807715 | US5863560 |