|
30.04.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2024 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2024 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
15.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
10.10.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
26.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.08.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings - with annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.05.2023 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
20.07.2022 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
20.07.2022 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2022 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2022 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2017 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Deficiencies in application documents - annex C |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |