Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017210389 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017210282 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177336 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017210277 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017210179 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017210171 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017210082 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177188 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11284707 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2022 | B2 | US2019104840 | 11.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US35390 | 01.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11259623 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B2 | US2019216212 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35188 | 31.05.2017 | US201916361178 | 21.03.2019 | US201715729261 | 10.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11206916 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2021 | B2 | US2021169209 | 10.06.2021 | A9 | US2019104834 | 11.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US34980 | 30.05.2017 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10874205 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2020 | B2 | US2019000223 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | WO2017US34965 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019104833 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2019 | A1 | US10251470 | 09.04.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201715729261 | 10.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102297299B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2021 | B1 | KR20190002655 | 08.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US34980 | 30.05.2017 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102237648B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2021 | B1 | KR20190003715 | 09.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35180 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102223596B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2021 | B1 | KR20190003714 | 09.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35384 | 01.06.2017 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102223594B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2021 | B1 | KR20190002654 | 08.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US35390 | 01.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102216265B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2021 | B1 | KR20190003755 | 09.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US34484 | 25.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177188 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102216264B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2021 | B1 | KR20190003717 | 09.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | WO2017US34965 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102216259B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2021 | B1 | KR20190003716 | 09.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35188 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177336 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022043044 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | JP2018563130 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | WO2017US34965 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022000183 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018563141 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7191449B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2022 | B2 | JP2021118917 | 12.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177188 | 30.06.2016 | JP2018563005 | 25.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021106898 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | JP2018563179 | 01.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021100576 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177336 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | JP2018562922 | 31.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021035503 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7063824B | Global Dossier | 09.05.2022 | B2 | JP2019520126 | 18.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US35390 | 01.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7126952B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2022 | B2 | JP2019517327 | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35384 | 01.06.2017 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6833874B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2021 | B2 | JP2019517325 | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US34980 | 30.05.2017 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7236864B | Global Dossier | 10.03.2023 | B2 | JP2019517324 | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35180 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7195152B | Global Dossier | 23.12.2022 | B2 | JP2019517322 | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | WO2017US34965 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019517317 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US34484 | 25.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177188 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7086865B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2022 | B2 | JP2019517311 | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35188 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177336 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251552 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2021 | B1 | EP3251552 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251551 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2020 | B1 | EP3251551 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251550 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2020 | B1 | EP3251550 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251549 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B1 | EP3251549 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251547 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | B1 | EP3251547 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251546 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2021 | B1 | EP3251546 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116869274 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US34980 | 30.05.2017 | CN201780034446 | 30.05.2017 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116849447 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35188 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177336 | 30.06.2016 | CN201780034447 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116058592 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | WO2017US34965 | 30.05.2017 | CN201780034448 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116035344 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35180 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | CN201780034408 | 31.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109475226 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35180 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109310203B | Global Dossier | 06.07.2021 | B | CN109310203 | 05.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US34484 | 25.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177188 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109310202B | Global Dossier | 16.04.2024 | B | CN109310202 | 05.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35384 | 01.06.2017 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109310201B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2021 | B | CN109310201 | 05.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US35390 | 01.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109219373 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | WO2017US34965 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109219372 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35188 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177336 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109219371 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US34980 | 30.05.2017 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3026171 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2023 | C | CA3026171 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US34484 | 25.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177188 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025876 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2021 | C | CA3025876 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35384 | 01.06.2017 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025865 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2022 | C | CA3025865 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | WO2017US34965 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025840 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2021 | C | CA3025840 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US35390 | 01.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025824 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | C | CA3025824 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35188 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177336 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025820 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | C | CA3025820 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35180 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025772 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | C | CA3025772 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US34980 | 30.05.2017 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020201372B | Global Dossier | 17.02.2022 | B2 | AU2020201372 | 12.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | AU2020201372 | 25.02.2020 | AU2017273725 | 01.06.2017 | WO2017US35390 | 01.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017275583B | Global Dossier | 02.01.2020 | B2 | AU2017275583 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35180 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017275505B | Global Dossier | 20.02.2020 | B2 | AU2017275505 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US34980 | 30.05.2017 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017275497B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2020 | B2 | AU2017275497 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177183 | 30.06.2016 | WO2017US34965 | 30.05.2017 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017275479B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2019 | B2 | AU2017275479 | 20.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US34484 | 25.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177188 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017273725 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | WO2017US35390 | 01.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017273722B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2020 | B2 | AU2017273722 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35384 | 01.06.2017 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017273526B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2019 | B2 | AU2017273526 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35188 | 31.05.2017 | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177336 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2776230T | 29.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2778085T | 07.08.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2795427T | 23.11.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2865154T | 15.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2865186T | 15.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3251547T | 08.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3251547T | 24.06.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3251549T | 29.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3251550T | 13.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177188 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3251551T | 24.08.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | EP16172797 | 03.06.2016 | EP16177192 | 30.06.2016 | EP16172799 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017210394 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021058726 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251548 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2024 | B1 | EP3251548 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2975359T | 04.07.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16172798 | 03.06.2016 |