EP3101674 - SWITCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HISADA, Masahito c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260,Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Makoto c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260,Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 16172817.5 | 03.06.2016 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | JP20150113065 | 03.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015113065 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101674 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3101674 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01H25/04 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
H01H25/041 (EP,CN,US);
H01H25/04 (US);
H01H9/04 (US);
H01H2025/043 (EP,US);
H01H2025/046 (CN);
H01H2219/036 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2016/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHALTVORRICHTUNG | [2016/49] | English: | SWITCH DEVICE | [2016/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 30.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2016 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | IE | 03.06.2019 | LU | 03.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.06.2016 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 03.06.2016 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1426991 (LEAR AUTOMOTIVE EEDS SPAIN [ES]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0013] - [0025]; figure 1 * [I] 7; | [A]DE102012017122 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0046] - [0051]; figures 5-18 * | by applicant | JP2004071416 |