EP3252211 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A HEAT PUMP LAUNDRY DRYING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARZENA, Fabio Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
RAGOGNA, Roberto Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 03 /
SILLO, Davide Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 04 /
RICCI, Alessandro Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2017/49] | Application number, filing date | 16172901.7 | 03.06.2016 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3252211 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3252211 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/20, D06F58/28 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
D06F58/38 (EP,US);
D06F2101/02 (EP,US);
D06F2103/08 (EP,US);
D06F2103/10 (EP,US);
D06F2103/32 (EP,US);
D06F2103/36 (EP,US);
D06F2103/50 (EP,US);
D06F2103/58 (EP,US);
D06F2105/24 (EP,US);
D06F2105/26 (EP,US);
D06F2105/30 (EP,US);
D06F2105/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] |
Former [2017/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES WÄRMEPUMPENWÄSCHETROCKNERS | [2017/49] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A HEAT PUMP LAUNDRY DRYING MACHINE | [2017/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UNE MACHINE DE SÉCHAGE DE LINGE DE POMPE À CHALEUR | [2017/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 11.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2016 | AL | 15.05.2019 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | ES | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | NL | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | IE | 03.06.2019 | LU | 03.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.06.2016 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 03.06.2016 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1541745 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0013] , [0022]; figure 1 *; | [AD]WO2012041699 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, line 516 * * page 2, line 13 - page 6, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2610402 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0024]; figures 5-7 * | by applicant | EP2622120 |