EP3101598 - AUGMENTED NEURAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeepMind Technologies Limited 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states DeepMind Technologies Limited 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2016/49] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grefenstette, Edward Thomas 7 Pancras Square Kings Cross London, N1C 4AG / GB | 02 /
Hermann, Karl Moritz 7 Pancras Square Kings Cross London, N1C 4AG / GB | 03 /
Suleyman, Mustafa 7 Pancras Square Kings Cross London, N1C 4AG / GB | 04 /
Blunsom, Philip 7 Pancras Square Kings Cross London, N1C 4AG / GB | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 16172981.9 | 03.06.2016 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | US201562172023P | 05.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562172023 P | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3101598 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3101598 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/063, G06N3/08 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP,US);
G06N3/082 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | G06N3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] |
Former [2016/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERWEITERTE NEURONALE NETZWERKE | [2016/49] | English: | AUGMENTED NEURAL NETWORKS | [2016/49] | French: | RÉSEAUX NEURONAUX AUGMENTÉS | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/50] | 09.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2021 | 07.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - G Z Sun ET AL, "The Neural Network Pushdown Automaton: Model, Stack and Learning Simulations", UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND TR NOs. UMIACS-TR-93-77 & CS-TR-3118, (19930820), pages 1 - 36, URL: https://clgiles.ist.psu.edu/papers/UMD-CS-TR-3118.recurrent.net.pushdown.automata.pdf, (20170222), XP055348713 [X] 1-6,12,13 * Sections I-III * [I] 7-11 | [XAI] - Armand Joulin ET AL, "Inferring Algorithmic Patterns with Stack-Augmented Recurrent Nets", (20150601), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://arxiv.org/pdf/1503.01007.pdf, (20160107), XP055239416 [X] 1-3,6,12,13 * Section 4 * [A] 4,5,9,10 [I] 7,8,11 | [XP] - Edward Grefenstette ET AL, "Learning to Transduce with Unbounded Memory", (20151103), pages 1 - 14, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1506.02516.pdf, (20170127), XP055339978 [XP] 1-13 * the whole document * |