08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
02.08.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
31.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
24.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
20.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.11.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.08.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
07.06.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.01.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
13.01.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.01.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
13.01.2017 |
First examination report |
|
30.11.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|