EP3103332 - MATERIAL WITH CONTROLLED RELEASE OF AN ACTIVE SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crea 215 avenue de la Roche Parnale Z.I. La Motte Longue 74130 Bonneville / FR | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERLING, Marie Chalet Renoncule Les Jardins de Chartreuse 38700 LE SAPPEY EN CHARTREUSE / FR | 02 /
BODO, Lionel 1527 route de chez Chardon 74130 AYZE / FR | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cedex / FR | [2016/50] | Application number, filing date | 16173616.0 | 08.06.2016 | [2016/50] | Priority number, date | FR20150055258 | 09.06.2015 Original published format: FR 1555258 | [2016/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3103332 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/08, A01N25/18, A01M1/10, A01N49/00, A01N37/06, A01N43/90, A01N31/02, A01N37/02, A01N35/02, A01N65/22, A01N31/06, A01N65/44, A01N65/08, A01N65/06, A01N65/28, A01N65/26, A01P7/00 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A01N25/18 (EP);
A01N25/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/08, A01N31/02, A01N31/06, A01N35/02, A01N37/02, A01N37/06, A01N43/90, A01N49/00, A01N65/06, A01N65/08, A01N65/22, A01N65/26, A01N65/28, A01N65/44 (EP);
A01N25/18, A01N31/02, A01N31/06, A01N35/02, A01N37/02, A01N37/06, A01N43/90, A01N49/00, A01N65/06, A01N65/08, A01N65/22, A01N65/26, A01N65/28, A01N65/44 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] |
Former [2016/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIAL MIT PROGRESSIVER FREISETZUNG EINER AKTIVEN SUBSTANZ | [2016/50] | English: | MATERIAL WITH CONTROLLED RELEASE OF AN ACTIVE SUBSTANCE | [2016/50] | French: | MATERIAU A LIBERATION PROGRESSIVE D'UNE SUBSTANCE ACTIVE | [2016/50] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 23.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9534200 (FERNZ CORP LIMITED [NZ], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 21 - line 27 * * page 3, line 6 - line 12 * * page 2, line 21; table 1 *; | [I]DE102012221966 (MATTHIES SUSANNE [DE]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * examples 1,2 *; | [A] - R. W. BEHLE ET AL, "Developing Wax-Based Granule Formulations for Mating Disruption of Oriental Beetles (Coleoptera: Scarabaeidae) in Turfgrass", JOURNAL OF ECONOMIC ENTOMOLOGY, (20081201), vol. 101, no. 6, doi:10.1603/0022-0493-101.6.1856, ISSN 0022-0493, pages 1856 - 1863, XP055209618 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * tables 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1603/0022-0493-101.6.1856 | by applicant | WO9534200 | DE102012221966 |