EP3106178 - CANDLE FILTER HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ervo Immobilien GmbH Kuhbrückweg 3 6714 Nüziders / AT | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willi, Erhard Brunnenfeld 51 6782 Silbertal / AT | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Swisspat Riederer Hasler Patentanwälte AG Kapellestrasse 17 9492 Eschen / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Kappelestrasse 15 9492 Eschen / LI | Application number, filing date | 16173803.4 | 09.06.2016 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | CH20150000821 | 09.06.2015 Original published format: CH 8212015 | [2016/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106178 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, B01D29/11, F01L9/04, A61L2/00, A61L2/02, A61L9/12 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A61L2/022 (EP);
A61L2/0017 (EP);
A61L2209/111 (EP);
A61L2209/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERZENFILTER-GEHÄUSE | [2016/51] | English: | CANDLE FILTER HOUSING | [2016/51] | French: | BOITIER DE FILTRE A BOUGIE | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2374519 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0036] *; | [X]WO2010129450 (BALDWIN FILTERS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0037]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2928499 (NALLINGER FRIEDRICH K H) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 42-50; figure 5 *; | [X]US1741672 (ARNOLD GEORGE A) [X] 1-14 * page 1, lines 75-84; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2011023550 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1a, 1b *; | [X]US3168467 (DREYER GEORGE W) [X] 1 * figure 5 *; | [X]WO2009065489 (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * |