EP3104308 - RADIOFREQUENCY TRANSPONDER DEVICE WITH PASSIVE RESONANT CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAHOUI, Nizar c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 02 /
BUYUKKALENDER, Arek c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 03 /
SEBAN, Frédérick c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | [2016/50] | Application number, filing date | 16173819.0 | 15.05.2012 | [2016/50] | Priority number, date | EP20110305594 | 17.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11305594 | [2016/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3104308 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
G06K19/07773 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07775 (EP,US);
G06K19/07794 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2016/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FUNKFREQUENZ-TRANSPONDERVORRICHTUNG MIT OPTIMIERTEM PASSIVEM RESONANZKREIS | [2016/50] | English: | RADIOFREQUENCY TRANSPONDER DEVICE WITH PASSIVE RESONANT CIRCUIT | [2016/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF TRANSPONDEUR RADIOFRÉQUENCE À CIRCUIT RÉSONANT PASSIF OPTIMISÉ | [2016/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35] | 19.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12720528.4 / EP2710523 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0977145 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0131]; figure 14 *; | [I]JP2002150245 (SAMSUNG SDS CO LTD, et al) [I] 1-14* figure 1 * | by applicant | US5955723 | US6378774 |