EP3257843 - METHOD OF PREPARING A HIGH PURITY IMIDAZOLIUM SALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xinming 2-8-2, Rinkan Yamato-shi 242-0003 Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
ZEHNACKER, Olivier Anton-Kayser-Strasse 22 44263 Dortmund / DE | 03 /
WILLY, Benjamin Toulouser Allee 9 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Rolf John-Wesley-Str. 2 63584 Gründau-Rothenbergen / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16174303.4 | 14.06.2016 | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3257843 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/20 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D233/58 (CN);
C07D239/20 (EP,US);
C07F9/11 (CN);
C07F9/141 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM IMIDAZOLIUMSALZ | [2017/51] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING A HIGH PURITY IMIDAZOLIUM SALT | [2017/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRÉPARER UN SEL TRES PUR D'IMIDAZOLIUM | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 07.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2004016631 (CYTEC CANADA INC [CA], et al) [AD] 1-10* page 15 - page 16; examples 7-9 *; | [A] - SHARON I. LALL-RAMNARINE ET AL, "Probing the Physical Properties, Synthesis and Cellulose Dissolution Ability of Dialkyl Phosphate Ionic Liquids", PHOSPHORUS, SULFUR AND SILICON AND THE RELATED ELEMENTS, (20141231), vol. 190, no. 5-6, doi:10.1080/10426507.2014.985824, ISSN 1042-6507, pages 891 - 895, XP055288918 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10426507.2014.985824 | by applicant | WO2004016631 | US2011247494 | - Y. LUO ET AL., APPL. THERMAL ENG, (2011), vol. 31, pages 2772 - 2777 | - Y. LUO ET AL., SOLAR ENERGY, (2012), vol. 86, pages 2718 - 2724 |