EP3106224 - ION EXCHANGE CHROMATOGRAPHY COLUMN, METHOD, AND SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dionex Corporation 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAYARAMAN, Manikandan c/o 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 02 /
POHL, Christopher A. c/o 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 03 /
SAINI, Charanjit c/o 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/30] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | ||
Former [2016/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16174343.0 | 14.06.2016 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | US201514744348 | 19.06.2015 Original published format: US201514744348 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106224 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3106224 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/36, B01J39/20, B01J39/26, B01J39/04, B01D15/20 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
B01D15/206 (EP,US);
G01N30/96 (US);
B01D15/362 (EP,US);
B01J39/05 (EP,US);
B01J39/07 (EP,US);
B01J39/20 (EP,US);
B01J39/26 (EP,US);
B01J41/07 (EP,US);
B01J41/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | B01J39/04, B01D15/36, B01J39/20, B01J39/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2016/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IONENAUSTAUSCHCHROMATOGRAFIESÄULE, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2016/51] | English: | ION EXCHANGE CHROMATOGRAPHY COLUMN, METHOD, AND SYSTEM THEREOF | [2016/51] | French: | COLONNE DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE D'ÉCHANGE D'IONS, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉS | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19172227.1 / EP3539659 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2016 | AL | 24.07.2019 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | NO | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 14.06.2016 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5281631 (HORWITZ E PHILIP [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,13,14,21-24 * column 2, lines 37-55 * * column 3, lines 31-40 * * column 3, lines 50-56 *; | [A]US5503933 (AFEYAN NOUBAR B [US], et al) [A] 1-26* column 2, lines 22-49 *; | [X]US5712347 (TROCHIMCZNK ANDRZEJ W [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 6, lines 43-61 * * column 7, lines 9-18 * * column 7, lines 44-55 * * column 8, lines 13-53 * * column 10, lines 1-5 *; | [XYI] - REY M A ET AL, "Novel cation-exchange stationary phase for the separation of amines and of six common inorganic cations", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (19960719), vol. 739, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0021-9673(96)00042-8, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 87 - 97, XP004039368 [X] 1-4,8-12,16,19,20,25,26 * abstract * * page 89, column l, lines 37-45 * * page 90, column l, lines 2-10 * * page 90, column r, lines 12-21 * * figures 2,3 * * page 89, column r, lines 9-14 * [Y] 5-7,13,14,21-24 [I] 15,17,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(96)00042-8 | by applicant | US4999098 | US6225129 | US6328885 | US6544484 | US6568245 | US6682701 | US2009218238 | US8415168 |