EP3106833 - INERTIAL SENSOR WITH COUPLE SPRING FOR COMMON MODE REJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP USA, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin TX 78735 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states NXP USA, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive Austin TX 78735 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singer, Stefan NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Gerster, Jochen NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Herrmann, Stephan NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Neff, Albrecht NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Freescale law department - EMEA patent ops NXP Semiconductors 134 avenue du Général Eisenhower BP 72329 31023 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 16174422.2 | 14.06.2016 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | US201514742452 | 17.06.2015 Original published format: US201514742452 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3106833 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3106833 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/574, G01P1/00, G01C19/5733 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
G01C19/5733 (EP,US);
G01C19/5747 (CN);
G01C19/5621 (US);
G01C19/5614 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2016/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGHEITSSENSOR MIT PAARFEDER FÜR GLEICHTAKTUNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2016/51] | English: | INERTIAL SENSOR WITH COUPLE SPRING FOR COMMON MODE REJECTION | [2016/51] | French: | CAPTEUR INERTIEL À RESSORT POUR COUPLER LE REJET DU MODE COMMUN | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 04.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005072231 (CHOJNACKI ERIC P [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,10-12 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005229703 (GEEN JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,10-12 * paragraphs [0037] , [0040] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2010037690 (GUENTHNER STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,10-12 * figure 1a *; | [XY]US2010154543 (DIEM BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0033] , [0041] , [0043] , [0048] , [0062] * * figures 1,3-5 * [Y] 4,8,9,13-15; | [X]US2010186507 (GUENTHNER STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0028] , [0077] , [0101] * * figure 19 *; | [Y]US2011094301 (ROCCHI ALESSANDRO [IT]) [Y] 8,9,15 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2011303007 (ROCCHI ALESSANDRO [IT]) [Y] 4,8,13-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US8453504 (MAO MINYAO [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7,10-12* figure 1 * |