EP3107029 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUSTOMIZED ELECTRONICALLY SIGNING OF A DOCUMENT, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Kommandantenstraße 18 10969 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Identity Trust Management AG Lierenfelder Straße 51 40231 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Selhorst, Marcel Florastr. 15 12163 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Entschew, Enrico Schmollerstr. 7 12435 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Bühler, Gregor Elseestr. 21 13467 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Feldmann, Jan Philipp Dr.-Conrad-Str. 7 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 05 /
Brose, Ference Driesener Str. 3 10439 Berlin / DE | 06 /
Krause, Philipp Invalidenstr. 7 10115 Berlin / DE | 07 /
von Nell, Pia Luisenstrasse 39 10117 Berlin / DE | [2020/08] |
Former [2016/51] | 01 /
Selhorst, Marcel Florastr. 15 12163 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Entschew, Enrico Schmollerstr. 7 12435 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Bühler, Gregor Elseestr. 21 13467 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
Feldmann, Jan Philipp Dr.-Conrad-Str. 7 45721 Haltern am See / DE | |||
05 /
Brose, Ference Driesener Str. 3 10439 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
Krause, Philipp Invalidenstr. 7 10115 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/21] |
Former [2016/51] | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16174622.7 | 15.06.2016 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | DE201510109607 | 16.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015109607 | [2016/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107029 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3107029 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/64, G06F21/32, H04L29/06, H04L9/32 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F21/645 (EP);
H04L63/0861 (EP);
H04L63/126 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2016/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PERSONALISIERTEN ELEKTRONISCHEN SIGNIEREN EINES DOKUMENTS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2016/51] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUSTOMIZED ELECTRONICALLY SIGNING OF A DOCUMENT, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2016/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SIGNATURE ELECTRONIQUE PERSONNALISEE D'UN DOCUMENT ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 25.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2016 | AL | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | HR | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MK | 23.05.2018 | MT | 23.05.2018 | NL | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | PT | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | RS | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | SM | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | IE | 15.06.2018 | LU | 15.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | NO | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.06.2016 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MK | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.06.2016 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003105966 (PU ERIC [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0013] , [0025] - [0030] - [0033] - [0035] - [0039]; figures 1, 2 *; | [I]US2008209516 (NASSIRI NICK [US]) [I] 1-13 * Absätze [0003] - [0004], [0033] - [0038], [0044], [0049], [0058], [0069], [0071] - [0073], [0079] - [0082], [0085] - [0086], [0090] - [0091], [0096] - [0100], [0103] - [0106];; figures 1, 4A, 4C, 9 *; | [A]US2014354758 (SPENCE CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] - [0008] , [0021] , [0037] , [0039] - [0040] - [0042] , [0044] , [0049] , [0054]; figures 1, 4 *; | [A]US8924729 (OAKES III CHARLES LEE [US]) [A] 1-13* Spalte 1, Zeile 51 - 61; Spalte 2, Zeile 41 - 46; Spalte 4, Zeile 17 - 62; Spalte 5, Zeile 46 - Spalte 6, Zeile 37; Spalte 9, Zeile 54 - Spalte 11, Zeile 41;; figures 3, 6 * |