06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
23.12.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
16.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
14.01.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
07.01.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.01.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.01.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.11.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.02.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.10.2019 |
First examination report |
|
28.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.01.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
27.01.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
27.01.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
17.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|