Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10243169 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2019 | B2 | US2017062763 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150119378 | 25.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102377173B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2022 | B1 | KR20170024623 | 08.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150119378 | 25.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106486519B | Global Dossier | 09.08.2019 | B | CN106486519 | 08.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150119378 | 25.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3136464 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2022 | B1 | EP3136464 | 01.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150119378 | 25.08.2015 |