EP3260991 - SYSTEM AND METHOD CONFIGURED TO EXECUTE DATA MODEL TRANSFORMATIONS ON DATA FOR CLOUD BASED APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adler, Michael Gersweilerstraße 15 90469 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Verma, Amit Friedrich Bauer Str. 7 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 16175174.8 | 20.06.2016 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3260991 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
G06F16/252 (EP,US);
G06F16/144 (US);
G06F16/24 (CN);
G06F16/24564 (EP,US);
G06F16/24573 (EP,US);
H04L45/60 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2017/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON DATENMODELLTRANSFORMATIONEN AN DATEN FÜR CLOUD-BASIERTE ANWENDUNGEN | [2017/52] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD CONFIGURED TO EXECUTE DATA MODEL TRANSFORMATIONS ON DATA FOR CLOUD BASED APPLICATIONS | [2017/52] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ CONÇUS POUR EXÉCUTER DES TRANSFORMATIONS DE MODÈLE DE DONNÉES SUR DES DONNÉES POUR DES APPLICATIONS EN CLOUD | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 21.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 12.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004254924 (DETTINGER RICHARD D [US], et al) [I] 1-27 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049] *; | [I]GB2431257 (CELONA TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [I] 1-27 * figures 2,3 * * page 13, line 3 - line 26 ** page 16, line 3 * |