EP3261130 - PHOTODETECTOR DEVICE WITH INTEGRATED HIGH-CONTRAST GRATING POLARIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ams AG Schloss Premstätten Tobelbader Str. 30 8141 Premstätten / AT | [2018/52] |
Former [2017/52] | For all designated states ams AG Schloss Premstätten Tobelbader Strasse 30 8141 Unterpremstätten / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofrichter, Jens c/o ams AG IP Department High Tech Campus 41 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Enenkel, Jan Am Brunnboden 28 8101 Gratkorn / AT | [2020/42] |
Former [2017/52] | 01 /
Hofrichter, Jens Obstgartenweg 13 8136 Gattikon / CH | ||
02 /
Enenkel, Jan Am Brunnboden 28 8101 Gratkorn / AT | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 16175275.3 | 20.06.2016 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261130 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261130 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0232 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
H01L31/02327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2017/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHOTODETEKTORVORRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEM KONTRASTREICHEM GITTERPOLARISATOR | [2017/52] | English: | PHOTODETECTOR DEVICE WITH INTEGRATED HIGH-CONTRAST GRATING POLARIZER | [2017/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF PHOTODÉTECTEUR À POLARISEUR DE GRILLE À FORT CONTRASTE INTÉGRÉ | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2016 | AL | 18.11.2020 | AT | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | ES | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | IT | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | MK | 18.11.2020 | NL | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SE | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | TR | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | NO | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | PT | 18.03.2021 | GB | 20.06.2021 | IE | 20.06.2021 | LU | 20.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | FR | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.06.2016 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 20.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 20.06.2016 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 20.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 20.06.2016 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 20.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 20.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 20.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 20.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2746826 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2015053922 (NAKAJIMA KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]FR3015113 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 10, line 17 - page 15; figures 3-6 * | by applicant | US2007115553 | US2014353583 | US2014353530 | - M. GUILLAUMEE ET AL., "Polarization sensitive silicon photodiodes using nanostructured metallic grids", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2009), vol. 94, doi:doi:10.1063/1.3133862, page 193503, XP012121278 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3133862 | - W. HOFMANN ET AL., "Long-Wavelength High-Contrast Grating Vertical-Cavity Surface-Emitting Laser", IEEE PHOTONICS JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/JPHOT.2010.2049009, pages 415 - 422, XP011484962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPHOT.2010.2049009 | - T. STOFERLE ET AL., "Ultracompact Silicon/Polymer Laser with an Absorption-Insensitive Nanophotonic Resonator", NANO LETTERS, (2010), vol. 10, pages 3675 - 3678 | - C. J. CHANG-HASNAIN; W. YANG, "High-contrast gratings for integrated optoelectronics", ADVANCES IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS, (2012), vol. 4, pages 379 - 440 |