EP3154124 - TEN-FREQUENCY BAND ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taoglas Limited No. 2-2, Lane 66, ZhongShang 1st Road Taoyuan City 33454 / TW | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINLAN, Ronan No. 2-2, Lane 66 ZhongShang 1st Road 33454 Taoyuan City / TW | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 16175514.5 | 21.06.2016 | [2017/15] | Priority number, date | TW20150132758 | 06.10.2015 Original published format: TW 104132758 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3154124 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3154124 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/38, H01Q1/48, H01Q5/378 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
H01Q1/38 (EP);
H01Q1/48 (EP);
H01Q5/378 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2017/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZEHN-FREQUENZ-BANDANTENNE | [2017/15] | English: | TEN-FREQUENCY BAND ANTENNA | [2017/15] | French: | ANTENNE À BANDE À DIX FRÉQUENCES | [2017/15] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 05.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18185525.5 / EP3444896 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2016 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | IT | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | MT | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | PT | 01.12.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.06.2016 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.06.2016 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014058926 (ZUNIGA ELEAZAR [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1A-1C, 2A-2B, 5A-5B, 6 * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098] *; | [A]US8779988 (YANG TSAI-YI [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1, 6-7 * * column 2, line 29 - line 33 * * column 3, line 26 - line 32 * |