EP3121371 - TURBINE WITH COOLED TURBINE GUIDE VANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 OT Dahlewitz 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Negulescu, Dimitrie c/o Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | 02 /
Täge, Jens c/o Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | 03 /
Negulescu, Joana c/o Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | 04 /
Lehmann, Knut c/o Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2020/40] |
Former [2020/27] | 01 /
Negulescu, Dimitrie Lissabonallee 29 14163 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Täge, Jens Hohes Feld 46 15566 Schöneiche / DE | |||
03 /
Negulescu, Joana Lissabonallee 29 14163 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
Lehmann, Knut Finkenstrasse 14 15712 Königs Wusterhausen / DE | |||
Former [2017/21] | 01 /
Negulescu, Dimitrie, Dr. Lissabonallee 29 14163 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Täge, Jens Hohes Feld 46 15566 Schöneiche / DE | |||
03 /
Negulescu, Joana Lissabonallee 29 14163 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
Lehmann, Knut, Dr. Finkenstrasse 14 15712 Königs Wusterhausen / DE | |||
Former [2017/12] | 01 /
Negulescu, Dimitrie, Dr. Lissabonallee 29 14163 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Täge, Jens Hohes Feld 46 15566 Schöneiche / DE | |||
03 /
Negulescu, Joana Lissabonallee 29 14163 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
Lehmann, Knut, Dr. Finkensrasse 14 15712 Königs Wusterhausen / DE | |||
Former [2017/04] | 01 /
Negulescu, Dimitrie, Dr. Lissabonallee 29 14163 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Täge, Jens Hohes Feld 46 15566 Schöneiche / DE | |||
03 /
Negulescu, Joana Lissabonallee 29 14163 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
Lehmann, Knut, Dr. Finkensrasse 14 15712 Kénigs Wusterhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K. Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Patentanwälte Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 16175769.5 | 22.06.2016 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | DE201510111843 | 21.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015111843 | [2017/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3121371 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3121371 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08, F01D5/18 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
F01D5/081 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (US);
F01D25/12 (US);
F01D25/24 (US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/188 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2260/20 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2212 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TURBINE MIT GEKÜHLTEN TURBINENLEITSCHAUFELN | [2017/04] | English: | TURBINE WITH COOLED TURBINE GUIDE VANES | [2017/04] | French: | TURBINE COMPRENANT DES AUBES DIRECTRICES REFROIDIES | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2016 | AL | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | DK | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | ES | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | IT | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MK | 28.10.2020 | MT | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | RS | 28.10.2020 | SE | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | NO | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | AT | 22.06.2021 | GB | 22.06.2021 | IE | 22.06.2021 | LU | 22.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.06.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MK | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
AT | 22.06.2021 | ||
GB | 22.06.2021 | ||
IE | 22.06.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 22.06.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
AT | 22.06.2021 | ||
GB | 22.06.2021 | ||
IE | 22.06.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 22.06.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
AT | 22.06.2021 | ||
GB | 22.06.2021 | ||
IE | 22.06.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
AT | 22.06.2021 | ||
GB | 22.06.2021 | ||
IE | 22.06.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
GB | 22.06.2021 | ||
IE | 22.06.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
GB | 22.06.2021 | ||
IE | 22.06.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
GB | 22.06.2021 | ||
IE | 22.06.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
IE | 22.06.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
LU | 22.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | ES | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | ES | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | ES | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | ES | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2065334 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,9* page 6, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 3 *; | [Y]US3791758 (JENKINSON J) [Y] 2,3,5,7 * column 4, line 38 - column 4, line 61; figures 2,6 *; | [Y]EP1004748 (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1013882 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,9 * column 2, paragraph 9; figure 1 *; | [XYI]EP1921270 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 10, paragraph 76 - page 10, paragraph 80; figure 3 * [Y] 2,3,5 [I] 4; | [XYI]US7921654 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-3,5,9 * column 5, line 49 - column 7, line 27; figure 3 * [Y] 6,7,10,11 [I] 8; | [Y]EP2725191 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [Y] 6 * abstract * | Examination | EP1245804 |