EP3112377 - BIFUNCTIONAL POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunocore Ltd. 101 Park Drive Milton Park Abingdon OX14 4RY Oxfordshire / GB | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAKOBSEN, Bent Karsten Immunocore Limited 57 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4RX / GB | 02 /
VUIDEPOT, Annelise Brigitte Immunocore Limited 57 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4RX / GB | 03 /
LI, Yi Immunocore Limited 57 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4RX / GB | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/01] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16176249.7 | 19.05.2010 | [2017/01] | Priority number, date | GB20090008613 | 20.05.2009 Original published format: GB 0908613 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3112377 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3112377 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C12N15/62, A61K38/17, // A61K38/00 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K39/00114 (EP,US);
A61K47/6425 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/54 (US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,US);
C07K16/46 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2017/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BIFUNKTIONELLE POLYPEPTIDE | [2017/01] | English: | BIFUNCTIONAL POLYPEPTIDES | [2017/01] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES BIFONCTIONNELS | [2017/01] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 26.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10720803.5 / EP2432802 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2019
24.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/16] |
Former [2019/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 01.02.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.06.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.07.2020 | 22.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2020 | 04.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/36] | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9960120 (AVIDEX LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** page 15, lines 4-25 *; | [X]WO0193913 (SUNOL MOLECULAR CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, lines 15-24 * * page 4, lines 4-7 * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 19 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 11 * * page 14, lines 14-18 * * page 17, line 24 - page 19, line 2 * * examples 5-8,12 *; | [X]WO03020763 (AVIDEX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, lines 4-21 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 18 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 22 * * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 23 * * page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 2 * * page 16, line 26 - page 17, line 15 * * claims 1,11,18,19 *; | [XY]WO2004074322 (AVIDEX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 17 * * page 6, lines 4-12 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 13 * * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 13 * * page 14, lines 20-24 * * page 17, lines 27-30 * * page 19, lines 18,19 * * claims 1,11,12,18,19,21 * [Y] 5-9; | [X]US2004253632 (RHODE PETER R [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0096] , [0098] * * paragraphs [0220] , [ 222] , [ 226] , [ 244] - [0247]; claims 10, 11, 14 * * paragraph [0272] *; | [Y]WO2005113595 (AVIDEX LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, lines 20-25 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 24 * * page 11, line 24 - page 14, line 17 * * page 15, lines 14-32 * * page 20, lines 24-31 * * page 22, line 24 - page 23, line 20 *; | [Y]WO2006037960 (AVIDEX LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 31 * * page 4, line 7 - page 6, line 18 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 25 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 22 * * page 17, line 1 - page 18, line 9 *; | [A] - BIBOLLET-RUCHE FREDERIC ET AL, "The Quality of Chimpanzee T-Cell Activation and Simian Immunodeficiency Virus/Human Immunodeficiency Virus Susceptibility Achieved via Antibody-Mediated T-Cell Receptor/CD3 Stimulation Is a Function of the Anti-CD3 Antibody Isotype", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200810), vol. 82, no. 20, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 10271 - 10278, XP002600945 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 10272, column 1, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01319-08 | [A] - SCHLITT H J ET AL, "DIFFERENT ACTIVATION STATES OF HUMAN LYMPHOCYTES AFTER ANTIBODY-MEDIATED STIMULATION VIA CD3 AND THE ALPHA-BETA T CELL RECEPTOR", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 32, no. 6, ISSN 0300-9475, pages 717 - 726, XP002600946 [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - LI BOHUA ET AL, "Construction and characterization of a humanized anti-human CD3 monoclonal antibody 12F6 with effective immunoregulation functions", IMMUNOLOGY, (200512), vol. 116, no. 4, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 487 - 498, XP002600947 [A] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-2567.2005.02247.X | by applicant | WO03020763 | - NEETHLING FA. ET AL., VACCINE, (2008), vol. 26, no. 25, pages 3092 - 102 | - CHAMES P. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2000), vol. 97, no. 14, pages 7969 - 74 | - WILLEMSEN RA. ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 174, no. 12, pages 7853 - 8 | - WILLEMSEN R. ET AL., CYTOMETRY A, (2008), vol. 73, no. 11, pages 1093 - 9 | - DENKBERG G. ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 171, no. 5, pages 2197 - 207 | - MARGET M. ET AL., MOL LMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 643 - 9 | - MOSQUERA LA. ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 174, no. 7, pages 4381 - 8 | - BELMONT HJ. ET AL., CLIN IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 121, no. 1, pages 29 - 39 | - WEN J. ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL LMMUNOTHER, (2008), vol. 57, no. 12, pages 1781 - 94 | - WEN J. ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER, (2008), vol. 57, no. 12, pages 1781 - 94 | - PAN ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2000), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 1234 - 8 | - PAN, BIOTECHNIQUES, (2000), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 1234 - 8 | Opposition | WO0193913 | WO03020763 | WO2004033685 | WO2004074322 | US2004253632 | WO2006037960 | WO2008135734 | US2009042285 | - ORTIZ-SANCHEZ E et al., "Antibody- cytokine fusion proteins: applica- tions in cancer therapy", Expert Opin Biol Ther., (20080000), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 609 - 632, XP008145785 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14712598.8.5.609 | - MOLLOY PE et al., "Soluble T cell receptors: novel immunotherapies", Curr Opin Phar- macol, (20050800), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 438 - 443, XP004969013 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coph.2005.02.004 | - CARD KF et al., "A soluble single- chain T- cell receptor IL -2 fusion protein retains MHC-restricted peptide specificity and IL -2 bioac- tivity", Cancer Immunol Immu- nother, (20040000), vol. 53, pages 345 - 357, XP002351550 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-003-0450-3 | - PENG LS et al., "A single-chain IL -12 IgG3 an- tibody fusion protein retains anti- body specificity and IL -12 bioac- tivity and demonstrates antitumor activity", J Immunol., (19990701), vol. 163, no. 1, pages 250 - 258, XP002967832 | - JONATHAN M. BOULTER et al., "Stable, soluble T- cell receptor molecules for crys- tallization and therapeutics", Pro- tein Engineering, (20030901), vol. 16, no. 9, pages 707 - 711, XP002275339 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/gzg087 | - WEN J et al., "Targeting activity of a TCR/ IL -2 fusion protein against established tumors", Cancer Immu- nol Immunother, (20081200), vol. 57, no. 12, pages 1781 - 1794, XP019654552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-008-0504-7 | - DENKBERG G et al., "Recombinant antibodies with T- cell receptor-like specificity: novel tools to study MHC class I presen- tation", Autoimmun Rev., (20060400), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 252 - 257, XP005428923 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.autrev.2005.07.004 | - ARGOS P, "An investigation of oligo- peptides linking domains in protein tertiary structures and possible can- didates for general gene fusion", J Mol Biol., (19900220), vol. 211, no. 4, pages 943 - 958, XP009043079 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(90)90085-Z |