EP3144848 - LEXICON-FREE, MATCHING-BASED WORD-IMAGE RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conduent Business Services, LLC 100 Campus Drive, Suite 200 Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2021/04] |
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation 45 Glover Avenue P.O. Box 4505 Norwalk, CT 06856-4505 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLDEVILA, Albert Gordo 26 Rue Saint Jacques 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
ALMAZAN, Jon 26 Rue Saint Jacques 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Lord, Michael, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street GB-London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 16176896.5 | 29.06.2016 | [2017/12] | Priority number, date | US201514794479 | 08.07.2015 Original published format: US201514794479 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3144848 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G06V30/1985 (EP,US);
G06F18/29 (EP,US);
G06V30/19187 (EP,US);
G06V30/224 (US);
G06V30/226 (EP,US);
G06V30/268 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2017/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEXIKONFREIE, MATCHING-BASIERTE WORT-BILD-ERKENNUNG | [2017/12] | English: | LEXICON-FREE, MATCHING-BASED WORD-IMAGE RECOGNITION | [2017/12] | French: | RECONNAISSANCE D'IMAGE- MOT SUR LA BASE DE CORRESPONDANCES, SANS LEXIQUE | [2017/12] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 23.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2022 | 16.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/14] | 17.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.11.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |