EP3264622 - LOW COMPLEXITY, LOW POWER AND LONG RANGE RADIO RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semtech Corporation 200 Flynn Road Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELLER, Olivier Bernard André 7. Ch des Bassetries, Les Grandes Rivières 17220 Sainte Soulle / FR | 02 /
SORNIN, Nicolas 18 Rue Boileau 38700 La Tronche / FR | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 16177425.2 | 01.07.2016 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264622 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3264622 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/69 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H04B1/69 (EP,US);
H04L27/103 (KR);
H04L25/03318 (KR);
H04L27/14 (KR);
H04L27/26522 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2657 (US);
H04B2001/6912 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2018/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FUNKEMPFÄNGER MIT GROSSER REICHWEITE, NIEDRIGER KOMPLEXITÄT UND NIEDRIGER LEISTUNG | [2018/01] | English: | LOW COMPLEXITY, LOW POWER AND LONG RANGE RADIO RECEIVER | [2018/01] | French: | RÉCEPTEUR RADIO LONGUE PORTÉE À FAIBLE PUISSANCE, DE FAIBLE COMPLEXITÉ | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 16.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2016 | AL | 27.03.2019 | AT | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | ES | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | HR | 27.03.2019 | IT | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | LV | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | NL | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | NO | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IE | 01.07.2019 | LU | 01.07.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.07.2016 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 01.07.2019 | ||
LU | 01.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 01.07.2016 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 01.07.2019 | ||
LU | 01.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 01.07.2019 | ||
LU | 01.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 01.07.2019 | ||
LU | 01.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 01.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0231983 (ITRAN COMM LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1 * page 13, line 1 - line 20 * * page 14, line 2 - line 19 *; | [AD]EP2767847 (SEMTECH CORP [US]) [AD] 1-7 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] *; | [A]EP2975814 (SEMTECH CORP [US]) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0024] * | by applicant | EP0952713 | US6549562 | US6614853 | US6940893 | EP2449690 | EP2763321 | EP2767847 |