EP3112578 - OUTLET DEVICE OF A ROLLER SHUTTER BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/01] | ROLLER BLIND FRAME REMOVAL DEVICE | ||
[2017/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deprat Jean SA 139 Rue des Arts 59100 Roubaix / FR | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROUVOST, Fréderic 139 rue des Arts 59100 ROUBAIX / FR | 02 /
KIMPE, Florent 6 Avenue de la Créativité 59650 VILLENEUVE D'ASCQ / FR | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés C/o Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 31 rue des Poissonceaux CS 40009 59044 Lille Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16177622.4 | 01.07.2016 | [2017/01] | Priority number, date | FR20150056326 | 03.07.2015 Original published format: FR 1556326 | [2017/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3112578 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3112578 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/76, E06B9/78, E06B9/17 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
E06B9/78 (EP);
E06B9/17 (EP);
E06B9/17007 (EP);
E06B9/76 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2017/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSLASSVORRICHTUNG EINES ROLLLADENKASTENS | [2017/46] | English: | OUTLET DEVICE OF A ROLLER SHUTTER BOX | [2017/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SORTIE DE COFFRE DE VOLET ROULANT | [2017/01] |
Former [2017/01] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSROLLEN EINES ROLLLADENS AUS EINEM ROLLLADENKASTEN | ||
Former [2017/01] | ROLLER BLIND FRAME REMOVAL DEVICE | Examination procedure | 01.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 10.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2016 | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | MT | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | IE | 01.07.2018 | LU | 01.07.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 01.07.2016 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MK | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 01.07.2016 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0723065 (DEPRAT JEAN SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4,6,7 *; | [A]EP1764467 (DEPRAT JEAN SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP2503090 (ZURFLUH FELLER [FR]) [A] 1-10* figures 1-4 * |