EP3115563 - INSULATION SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR AN EXHAUST GAS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIPPEL, Bradly Aaron 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
FRESE, Christopher Conrad 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Lee, Brenda GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2017/02] | Application number, filing date | 16177644.8 | 01.07.2016 | [2017/02] | Priority number, date | US201514791540 | 06.07.2015 Original published format: US201514791540 | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3115563 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/14, F01D25/30, F02K1/82, F16B5/02, F23R3/00 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
F01D25/145 (EP,US);
F02C7/24 (CN);
F02C7/20 (CN,US);
F01D25/30 (EP,CN,US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02K1/822 (EP,US);
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F05D2240/14 (EP,US);
F05D2240/15 (EP,US);
F05D2260/31 (EP,US);
F16B5/02 (EP,US);
F23R3/60 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2017/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERUNGSBEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN ABGASSYSTEM | [2017/02] | English: | INSULATION SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR AN EXHAUST GAS SYSTEM | [2017/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT D'ISOLATION POUR UN SYSTÈME DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2017/02] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5957768 (SCHOCKEMOEHL GENE F [US], et al) [Y] 2,10-12,14,15 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 4; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2004107690 (POCCIA NICHOLAS PHILIP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0044] , [0051]; figure 9 *; | [X]JP2010121496 (YUTAKA GIKEN CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * figures 3,4 *; | [XY]EP2672072 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1,4-9 * paragraphs [0053] - [0056]; figure 6 * [Y] 2,10-12,14,15; | [AP]EP2933468 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [AP] 1-15* paragraphs [0042] - [0049]; figure 2 * |