EP3096370 - CHIPLET DISPLAY WITH MULTIPLE CONTROLLERS FOR A PASSIVE-MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/47] | CHIPLET DISPLAY WITH MULTIPLE PASSIVE-MATRIX CONTROLLERS | ||
[2018/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global OLED Technology LLC 13921 Park Center Road, Suite 380 Herndon, VA 20171 / US | [2018/24] |
Former [2016/47] | For all designated states Global OLED Technology LLC 13873 Park Center Road, Suite 330 Herndon, VA 20171 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COK, Ronald S. c/o 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650 / US | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16177767.7 | 15.10.2010 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096370 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3096370 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52, G09G3/30, G09G3/00, G09G3/34, G09G3/20, G09G3/32, G09G3/3216 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
G09G3/2085 (EP,KR);
G09G3/2088 (EP,KR);
G09G3/3208 (EP,KR);
G09G3/3216 (EP);
G09G3/3233 (KR);
H10K59/17 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Title | German: | CHIPLET-ANZEIGE MIT MEHREREN PASSIVMATRIXSTEUERUNGEN | [2016/47] | English: | CHIPLET DISPLAY WITH MULTIPLE CONTROLLERS FOR A PASSIVE-MATRIX | [2018/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE AVEC MULTIPLES CONTRÔLEURS POUR PANNEAUX À MATRICE PASSIVE | [2018/42] |
Former [2016/47] | CHIPLET DISPLAY WITH MULTIPLE PASSIVE-MATRIX CONTROLLERS | ||
Former [2016/47] | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE AVEC DE MULTIPLES CONTRÔLEURS À MATRICE PASSIVE | Examination procedure | 04.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 20.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10858510.0 / EP2628200 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2010 | AL | 06.03.2019 | AT | 06.03.2019 | CY | 06.03.2019 | CZ | 06.03.2019 | DK | 06.03.2019 | EE | 06.03.2019 | ES | 06.03.2019 | FI | 06.03.2019 | HR | 06.03.2019 | IT | 06.03.2019 | LT | 06.03.2019 | LV | 06.03.2019 | MC | 06.03.2019 | MK | 06.03.2019 | MT | 06.03.2019 | PL | 06.03.2019 | RO | 06.03.2019 | RS | 06.03.2019 | SE | 06.03.2019 | SI | 06.03.2019 | SK | 06.03.2019 | SM | 06.03.2019 | TR | 06.03.2019 | BG | 06.06.2019 | NO | 06.06.2019 | GR | 07.06.2019 | IS | 06.07.2019 | PT | 06.07.2019 | IE | 15.10.2019 | LU | 15.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.10.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.10.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.10.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.10.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007164936 (CHANG HUNG-JUNG [TW]); | [A]WO2010056289 (GLOBAL OLED TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010093855 (GLOBAL OLED TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) | Examination | US2005104822 | by applicant | US4769292 | US5061569 | US6384529 | US6919681 | US6987355 | US2006055864 | US2007057263 | US7230594 |