EP3100730 - N-(3-ETHYNYLPHENYL)-6,7-BIS(2-METHOXYETHOXY)-4-QUINAZOLINAMINE FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF NSCLC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSI Pharmaceuticals, LLC 1 Astellas Way Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONNELL, Richard, D. 23 Jeremy Drive East Lyme, CT 06333 / US | 02 /
MOYER, James, D 5 Jefferson Drive East Lyme, CT 06333 / US | 03 /
MORIN, Michael, J 8 Goundry Drive Waterford, CT 06385 / US | 04 /
KAJIJI, Shama, M 190 Mistuxet Avenue Mystic, CT 06355 / US | 05 /
FOSTER, Barbara, A 31 Rossie Street Mystic, CT 06355 / US | 06 /
FERRANTE, Karen, J. 10 Adirondack Drive East Greenwich, RI 02818 / US | 07 /
NORRIS, Timothy 27 Friar Tuck Drive Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US | 08 /
RAGGON, Jeffrey, W 754 Pendleton Drive North Stonington, CT 06339 / US | 09 /
SILBERMAN, Sandra, L 10 Heather Lane Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Haile, Alison Victoria Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16177821.2 | 09.11.2000 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | US19990164907P | 11.11.1999 Original published format: US 164907 P | US20000193191P | 30.03.2000 Original published format: US 193191 P | US20000206420P | 23.05.2000 Original published format: US 206420 P | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100730 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61P35/00 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
C07D239/94 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D239/86 (KR);
C07D239/88 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2016/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-(3-ETHINYLPHENYLAMINO)-6,7-BIS(2-METHOXYETHOXY)-4-CHINAZOLINAMIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NSCLC | [2016/49] | English: | N-(3-ETHYNYLPHENYL)-6,7-BIS(2-METHOXYETHOXY)-4-QUINAZOLINAMINE FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF NSCLC | [2016/49] | French: | N-(3-ETHYNYLPHENYLAMINO)-6,7-BIS(2-METHOXYETHOXY)-4-QUINAZOLINAMINE POUR TRAITER NSCLC | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 19.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2019 | Observations by third parties | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00980346.1 / EP1233948 | EP09150479.5 / EP2168581 | EP10185615.1 / EP2292233 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 20 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 18   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4853221 (ELSLAGER EDWARD F [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I]WO9630347 (PFIZER [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 18, line 16 - line 17; example 20; claim - * * page 19, paragraph 3 *; | [ID]US5747498 (SCHNUR RODNEY CAUGHREN [US], et al) [ID] 1-9 * column 1; example 20 * * column 14, line 1 - column 15, line 10; claim - * * column 16, line 45 - line 51 *; | [ID]WO9955683 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-9 * page 1 - page 2; claim - *; | [IP]EP1044969 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [IP] 1-9 * examples 4,7,9-11,13,16 * * page 2, line 5 - line 17 * * page 2, line 37 * * page 6, line 5 - line 6 *; | [IP] - NORRIS T ET AL, "Discovery of a new stable polymorph of 4-(3-ethynylphenylamino)-6,7-bis(2-methoxyethoxy)quinazolinium methanesulfonate using near-infrared spectroscopy to monitor form change kinetics", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 2, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (2000), vol. 12, ISSN 1472-779X, pages 2498 - 2502, XP002261707 [IP] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b003531i | [I] - POLLACK V A ET AL, "INHIBITION OF EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR-ASSOCIATED TYROSINE PHOSPHORYLATION IN HUMAN CARCINOMAS WITH CP-358,774: DYNAMICS OF RECEPTOR INHIBITION IN SITU AND ANTITUMOR EFFECTS IN ATHYMIC MICE", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND, US, (19991101), vol. 291, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 739 - 748, XP001014737 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * | [I] - POLLACK V A ET AL, "THERAPY OF HUMAN CARCINOMAS IN ATHYMIC MICE BY INHIBITION OF EGF RECEPTOR-MEDIATED SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION WITH CP-358774: DYNAMICS OF RECEPTOR INHIBITION AND ANTI-TUMOR EFFECTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199703), vol. 38, ISSN 0197-016X, page 633, XP001014764 [I] 1-9 * abstract * | [I] - MOYER, JAMES D. ET AL, "Induction of apoptosis and cell cycle arrest by CP-358774, an inhibitor of epidermal growth factor receptor tyrosine kinase", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 128:43513, URL: STN, XP002261709 [I] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - SMR COMMITEE, "Protein Kinases: Therapeutic Opportunities", THE NEWSLETTER FOR THE SOCIETY FOR MEDICINES RESEARCH, (199907), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 1 - 8, XP002261708 [A] 1-9 * page 5, column L, paragraph 2; examples 8,9 * | [A] - KREIL A ET AL, "IN-VITRO-EVALUIERUNG POTENTIELL EFFEKTIVER GEMCITABINE-KOMBINATIONSTH ERAPIEN BEIM EXOKRINEN PANKREASKARZINOM//IN VITRO EVALUATION OF POTENTIALLY EFFECTIVE GEMCITABINE-COMBINATION REGIMENS FOR PANCREATIC ADENOCARCINOMA", ACTA MEDICA AUSTRIACA, HOLLINEK, VIENNA, AU, (19990101), vol. 26, no. 3, ISSN 0303-8173, pages 93 - 100, XP009044936 [A] 1-9 * page 94; figures 1-5; table 4 * | [IP] - Anonymous, "Non-small-cell lung carcinoma - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20140825), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Non-small-cell_lung_carcinoma, (20150120), XP055163283 [IP] 1-9 * the whole document * | [IP] - W Yan, "Squamous cell carcinoma - similarities and differences among anatomical sites", AMERICAN J CANC RES, (20110215), pages 275 - 300, URL: http://www.ajcr.us/files/ajcr0000023.pdf, (20160818), XP055296331 [IP] 1-9 * the whole document * | [IP] - Winston W Tan, "Non-Small Cell Lung Cancer: Practice Essentials, Background, Pathophysiology", (20150716), URL: http://emedicine.medscape.com/article/279960-overview, (20160818), XP055296324 [IP] 1-9 * the whole document * | [IP] - Anonymous, "OSI Pharmaceuticas Provides Update on Anti-Cancer Programs with Pfizer", PR Newswire, (19991117), URL: www.prnewswire.com, (20160818), XP055296325 [IP] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0239362 | WO9005719 | EP0606046 | WO9519970 | WO9521613 | WO9627583 | WO9633172 | US5587458 | WO9713760 | EP0780386 | WO9722596 | WO9732856 | WO9802434 | WO9802438 | WO9802437 | WO9803516 | WO9807697 | WO9814451 | US5747498 | WO9830566 | WO9833768 | US5792783 | WO9834918 | WO9834915 | US5834504 | WO9850356 | WO9854093 | US5861510 | US5863949 | US5877305 | WO9910349 | US5883113 | US5886020 | WO9916755 | WO9924440 | WO9929667 | WO9935146 | WO9935132 | EP0931788 | WO9952910 | WO9952889 | WO9955683 | WO9960023 | WO9961422 | - ARCHER G.E., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 5, pages 2646 - 2652 | - G.E. PEOPLES ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 6547 - 6551 | - DK MOSCATELLO ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, pages 5536 - 5539 | - I. POSNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, no. 29, pages 20638 - 47 | - G. N. GILL; W. WEBER, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1987), vol. 146, pages 82 - 88 | EP19970304971 | WO1998IB01113 | US19980113647 | US19990117341 | US19990117346 | EP19990302232 | WO1999IB00797 | GB19990012961 | US19990148464 | EP19990308617 | other | US5747498 |