EP3118435 - POWER AUGMENTATION SYSTEM FOR A GAS TURBINE USING COMPRESSED AIR STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/20] |
Former [2017/03] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kihyung 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | 02 /
RANCRUEL, Diego Fernando 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 03 /
TONG, Leslie Yung Min 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, SC South Carolina 30339 / US | 04 /
WATTS, Stephen R. 300 Garlingto Road Mail Stop 1336 Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615-4614 / US | 05 /
MUNDRA, Kamlesh 1 River Road Schenectady, NY New York 12345 / US | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/20] |
Former [2017/03] | Lee, Brenda GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16178318.8 | 07.07.2016 | [2017/03] | Priority number, date | US201514797302 | 13.07.2015 Original published format: US201514797302 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3118435 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3118435 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/30, F02C6/08, F02C6/16, F02C7/143, F02C7/18, F02C1/02 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
F02C6/16 (EP,US);
F02C6/00 (CN);
F01D15/10 (US);
F02C1/02 (EP,US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02C3/305 (EP,US);
F02C6/08 (EP,US);
F02C7/143 (EP,US);
F02C7/18 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2220/62 (EP,US);
F05D2220/76 (EP,US);
F05D2260/213 (EP,US);
F05D2270/053 (EP,US);
F05D2270/061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSTEIGERUNGSSYSTEM MIT DRUCKLUFTENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM FÜR EINE GASTURBINE | [2017/03] | English: | POWER AUGMENTATION SYSTEM FOR A GAS TURBINE USING COMPRESSED AIR STORAGE | [2017/03] | French: | SYSTEME D'AUGMENTATION DE PUISSANCE POUR UNE TURBINE A GAZ UTILISANT STOCKAGE D'AIR COMPRIME | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/03] | SYSTÈME D'AUGMENTATION DE PUISSANCE POUR UNE TURBINE À GAZ UTILISANT STOCKAGE D'AIR COMPRIMÉ | Examination procedure | 07.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2016 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | IE | 07.07.2020 | LU | 07.07.2020 | FR | 13.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | GB | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.07.2016 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 07.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.07.2020 | ||
FR | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 07.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.07.2020 | ||
FR | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 07.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.07.2020 | ||
FR | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 07.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2001193483 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,10,11 * abstract *[I] 3-9,12-15; | [XI]US7389644 (NAKHAMKIN MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,11,14,15 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 48 * * abstract * [I] 3,4,7-9,12,13; | [XI]WO2010085272 (NAKHAMKIN MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * abstract * [I] 3,4,7-9,12,13; | [XI]US2011094236 (FINKENRATH MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 2-4 * [I] 3,4,7,9,12,13 |