Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10756941 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2020 | B1 | US2020252256 | 06.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16179086 | 12.07.2016 | WO2017JP25470 | 06.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6552753B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2019 | B2 | JP2019511169 | 18.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16179086 | 12.07.2016 | WO2017JP25470 | 06.07.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018012560 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16179086 | 12.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3270554 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2019 | B1 | EP3270554 | 17.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16179086 | 12.07.2016 |