08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
17.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
09.08.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
03.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.07.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.10.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.10.2018 |
First examination report |
|
20.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] |
13.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|